Nagpal, Anil Kumar (CPSO#: 64226)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili

Education:University of Nairobi, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 576-8080
Fax: (519) 576-8619
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Paris Sleep Lab
Paris Medical Arts
139 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2M4
Canada
Phone: (519) 442-6389
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anil Nagpal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Nagpal ( CPSO# 64226 )

Business Address:
305 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 576-8080

Business Address:
Paris Sleep Disorders Clinic
139 Grand River Street North
Paris ON  N3L 2M4
Phone Number: (519) 442-6389

Business Address:
Louise Marshall Hospital
630 Dublin Street
Mount Forest ON  N0G 2L3
Phone Number: (519) 323-2210

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Louise Marshall Hospital,North Wellington Health Care Mount Forest
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 26 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL KUMAR NAGPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGPAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992