Nagpal, Sudhir Kumar (CPSO#: 66353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Vascular Surgery
The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Box 627
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4766
Fax: (613) 761-5362
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sudhir Nagpal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nagpal ( CPSO# 66353 )

Business Address:
Division of Vascular Surgery
The Ottawa Hospital-Civic Campus
A280 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4766

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 31 Oct 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 31 Oct 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUDHIR KUMAR NAGPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGPAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 1998 to 31 Oct 1999
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 1999 to 31 Oct 2000
Resident 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004