Nagshabandi, Zuhdi Khalid Sulaiman (CPSO#: 81916)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2004 to 14 Nov 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 15 Nov 2004 to 29 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2005 to 29 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2006 to 29 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 30 Aug 2007 to 27 Apr 2008
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Apr 2008