Nagy, Amr Mohamed Abd Elaziz (CPSO#: 99907)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ain Shams University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medicine
4th Floor, room 427
Toronto, Ontario. M5G 1X5
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 2785
Fax: 416-864-5025
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMR MOHAMED ABD ELAZIZ NAGY shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. NAGY is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF OTTAWA;

(2) Dr. NAGY shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. NAGY is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. NAGY shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. NAGY is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. NAGY no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Mar 2013 to 19 Apr 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 16 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018