Nagy, Maria (CPSO#: 51044)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 20 Jan 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: Marton-Nagy, Maria (used until: 14 Dec 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:University of Sciences,Budapest, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Medical Clinic for Person Centred Psychotherapy Suite 403 265 York Lane Boulevard Toronto ON M2T 5C7 Tel: 416-229-2399
Date Received: 11 Jan 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jan 2016