Naiberg, Jerry Brian (CPSO#: 52769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 898-2444
Fax: (905) 898-5558
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Arts Building
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jerry B. Naiberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Naiberg ( CPSO# 52769 )

Business Address:
Medical Arts Building
Suite 104
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 08 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JERRY BRIAN NAIBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1983 to 11 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1985