Naidoo, Denisha (CPSO#: 71561)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone: (519) 766-1360
Fax: (519) 766-0469
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Denisha Naidoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Naidoo ( CPSO# 71561 )

Business Address:
83 Dawson Road
Guelph ON  N1H 1B1
Phone Number: (519) 766-1360

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENISHA NAIDOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIDOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 21 Jun 1997 to 23 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jul 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998