Naidoo, Radhakrishnan Prushothma (CPSO#: 56677)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Zimbabwe, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2238 Dundas Street West
Suite 302
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Phone: (416) 534-6379
Fax: (647) 352-0425
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.P. Naidoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Naidoo ( CPSO# 56677 )

Business Address:
Suite 302
2238 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 534-6379

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RADHAKRISHNAN PRUSHOTHMA NAIDOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIDOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1988