Naidoo, Suryakumari (CPSO#: 58929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3359 Mississauga Rd
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C6
Canada
Phone: (905) 828-5255
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Naidoo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Naidoo ( CPSO# 58929 )

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
3359 Mississauga Road
Mississauga ON  L5L 1C6
Phone Number: (905) 828-5255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SURYAKUMARI NAIDOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIDOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1987