Naik, Anjana Thakorbhai (CPSO#: 88175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Kerala, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone: (519) 491-1119
Fax: (519) 491-1469
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anil A. Garach Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Garach ( CPSO# 85828 )
Dr. A. Naik ( CPSO# 88175 )

Business Address:
110 Water Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 5T3
Phone Number: (519) 332-3330


Corporation Name: Dr. Anjana Naik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naik ( CPSO# 88175 )
Dr. M. Garach ( CPSO# 110046)

Business Address:
Suite 201
481 London Road
Sarnia ON  N7T 4X3
Phone Number: (519) 491-1119

Business Address:
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANJANA THAKORBHAI NAIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Mar 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2010