Naik, Neil Pravinkumar (CPSO#: 108785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
430 The Boardwalk
Unit 310
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: 519-571-7496
Fax: 519-954-3489
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Naik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Naik ( CPSO# 108785)

Business Address:
310 - 430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (226) 344-0789

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NEIL PRAVINKUMAR NAIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 06 Jun 2016 to 17 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 18 Jun 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016