Naiman, Alisa (CPSO#: 81096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 0C4
Phone: (416) 633-2345
Fax: (416) 633-2216
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alisa Naiman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naiman ( CPSO# 81096 )

Business Address:
545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 0C4
Phone Number: (416) 633-2345


Corporation Name: Dr. A. Naiman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Naiman ( CPSO# 81096 )

Business Address:
545 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 0C4
Phone Number: (416) 633-2345

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALISA NAIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2006