Nair, Asha (CPSO#: 75744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Nov 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Nov 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital
of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2664
Fax: (613) 738-4878
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Children's Treatment Centre
395 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L2
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-0871 Ext. 4412
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASHA NAIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2000 to 31 Oct 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Nov 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2003 to 01 Apr 2004
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2000