Nair, Bhavani Devadathan (CPSO#: 51878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jan 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Jun 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Pune, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 08 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 28 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 28 Jun 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from June 28, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Bhavani Devadathan
            Nair, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Nair to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")

                                                of

                              DR. BHAVANI DEVADATHAN NAIR
                                          ("Dr. Nair")

                                                to

                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
            ________________________________________________________________________

            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan. 
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Nair, certificate of registration number 51878, am a member of the
                  College. The College has inquired into my compliance with the requirement
                  to participate in a program of continuing professional development.    

            (3)   I, Dr. Nair, am currently not practising medicine in Ontario and I am
                  entering into this Undertaking as an alternative to complying with the
                  Continuing Professional Development requirement under section 29 of
                  Ontario Regulation 114/94 (made under the Medicine Act, 1991). 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Nair, undertake that, effective immediately, I will not practise
                  medicine in Ontario until each and every one of the following conditions
                  have been met:

                  (a)   I provide a minimum of forty-five (45) days' notice to the College
                        of my intent to return to the practice of medicine; 
                  
                  (b)   I provide the College with proof that I am participating in a
                        program of continuing professional development that meets the
                        requirements for continuing professional development of the Royal
                        College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada, the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada, or an organization that has been approved by
                        the College for that purpose that meets the requirements for
                        continuing professional development set by the Royal College of
                        Physicians and Surgeons of Canada or the College of Family
                        Physicians of Canada; and
                  
                  (c)   The College approves my return to the practice of medicine.
                  
            (5)   I, Dr. Nair, undertake that upon signing this Undertaking I shall forward
                  a request to the General Manager of the OHIP that my billing number be
                  deactivated for services rendered after the date I cease to practise and
                  before the date the College agrees that I may return to practise in
                  accordance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (6)   I, Dr. Nair, undertake to abide by the College's Policy on Practice
                  Management Considerations for Physicians Who Cease to Practise, Take an
                  Extended Leave of Absence or Close Their Practice Due to Relocation, a
                  copy of which is attached hereto as Appendix "A".  

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENTS

            (7)   I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that in considering my request to return to
                  practice, the College may, among other things:

                  (a)   request that I agree to specified terms, limitations or conditions
                        being placed upon my certificate of registration; and
                  
                  (b)   request that I enter into an appropriate assessment and/or
                        monitoring agreement with the College.
                  
            (9)   I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge and agree that I shall be solely responsible for
                  payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Nair, undertake to comply with the provisions and conditions of
                  this Undertaking and acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee or Fitness to Practise Committee of the College.

            (11)  I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that this entire Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. I understand that this Undertaking
                  shall be information on the College's Register that is available to the
                  public during the time period that the Undertaking remains in effect.

            (13)  I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that the following summary will appear on the
                  College's Register that is available to the public during the time period
                  that this Undertaking remains in effect:

                        Dr. Nair has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and
                        therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or
                        services.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Nair, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                  appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that
                  may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                  compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (15)  I, Dr. Nair, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "B" and that the consent forms part of this
                  Undertaking.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 28, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bhavani Devadathan Nair to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 28, 2017:

Dr. Nair has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.