Nair, Geetha Rajamma (CPSO#: 51264)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 11 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2016