Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Nair, Parameswaran Krishnan (CPSO#: 70786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jan 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Parameswaran, Krishnan Nair (used until: 09 Aug 2001 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Firestone Inst for Respiratory Hlth
Juravinski Innovation Tower-T2122
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34934
Fax: (905) 521-6183
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Respirology Effective: 06 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 28 Feb 1999
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Jan 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 06 Jan 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 19 Dec 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Parameswaran  Krishnan  Nair  may practise medicine independently in
                  respirology, only.