Nairn, Robert James (CPSO#: 94117)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Western Australia, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Jun 2011