Najeeb, Umberin (CPSO#: 85442)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Oct 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Internal Medicine
Room H-452
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 6737
Fax: (416) 480-6739
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UMBERIN NAJEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAJEEB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2006 to 17 Oct 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009