Naji, Khalid Ali A (CPSO#: 108839)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 11 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 15 May 2016 to 28 May 2016
PEAP - Resident - Cardiology

McMaster University, 29 May 2016 to 11 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 2016