Najjar, Hesham Abdulrahman Abdullah (CPSO#: 87979)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2008 to 20 Mar 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 21 Mar 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009