Najm, Hani Kamal (CPSO#: 61792)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 05 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 7 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998