Nakamura, Liane Sumiko (CPSO#: 64041)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite C9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H6
Phone: (905) 303-2700
Fax: (905) 303-2780
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Liane Nakamura Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Nakamura ( CPSO# 64041 )

Business Address:
Suite C9
1410 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Vaughan ON  L6A 4H6
Phone Number: (905) 303-2700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Mar 2018 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIANE SUMIKO NAKAMURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAKAMURA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1992