Nalezny, Stephan John (CPSO#: 85733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
132 Parkdale Avenue South Suite 207
Hamilton ON  L8K 3P3
Phone: (905) 544-5719
Fax: (905) 544-1218
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Feb 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHAN JOHN NALEZNY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NALEZNY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2006 to 20 Jan 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2010