Nallapaneni, Sailaja Puttagunta (CPSO#: 79631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu

Education:University of Alberta, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 202
3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3W5
Phone: (416) 773-1900
Fax: (416) 773-1902
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Renfrew Drive
Suite 130
Markham ON  L3R 9R6
Canada
Phone: (905) 948-9119
Fax: (905) 948-8358
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nallapaneni Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nallapaneni ( CPSO# 79631 )

Business Address:
202 - 3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3W5
Phone Number: (416) 773-1900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAILAJA PUTTAGUNTA NALLAPANENI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NALLAPANENI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009