Nam, Robert (CPSO#: 69196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room MG 406
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5075
Fax: (416) 480-6934
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Nam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Nam ( CPSO# 69196 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
MG - 406
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5075

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT NAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001