Namazie, Ali Mohammed (CPSO#: 82456)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 752-7871
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Namazie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Namazie ( CPSO# 82456 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 304-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI MOHAMMED NAMAZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAMAZIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2010