Namburi, Sriranjinee Surendrakumar (CPSO#: 78069)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Meadowlands Family Health Centre
Unit 5
35 Stone Church Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1S5
Phone: (905) 648-8999
Fax: (905) 648-8969
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Upper James Medical and
Rehab Wellness Center
666 Upper James St
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z3
Canada
Phone: (289) 674-2666
Fax: (905) 648-8969
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Namburi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 22 2007


Corporation Name: Namburi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Namburi ( CPSO# 78069 )

Business Address:
5 - 35 Stone Church Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1S5
Phone Number: (905) 648-8999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SRIRANJINEE SURENDRAKUMAR NAMBURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAMBURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2004