Nambyiah, Pratheeban (CPSO#: 99013)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Mar 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Oxford University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Aug 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2012 to 20 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Mar 2013