Namis, Nabil Nashat (CPSO#: 52321)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
125 Delhi Street
Suite 35
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Phone: (519) 824-8730
Fax: (519) 824-6030
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nabil Namis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Namis ( CPSO# 52321 )

Business Address:
125 Delhi Street
Suite S3-35
Guelph ON  N1E 4J5
Phone Number: (519) 824-8730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 04 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 02 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 15 Oct 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 15 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            As from October 15, 2016, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Nabil Nashat Namis,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Namis to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

            Dr. Namis' practice is restricted to office gynecology and gynecological
            surgery. 

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 May 2011
Summary:

 On May 2, 2011, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Nabil Nashat Namis committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by 
 members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee ordered and 
 directed that:


1.	Dr. Namis attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
 reprimand to be recorded on the register;

2.	The Registrar impose as terms, conditions and 
 limitations on Dr. Namis' certificate of registration:

a.	that Dr. Namis shall participate in and 
 successfully complete, at his own expense and within five months of the date of this Order, an 
 educational program in medical ethics approved by the College;

b.	that Dr. Namis, at his own 
 expense, shall participate in and successfully complete an educational program in medical 
 recordkeeping for obstetrics and gynecology attached [to the Order] as Schedule "A", with a 
 preceptor, to be approved by the College in its sole discretion and who has within fortyfive days 
 of the date of this Order signed an Undertaking to the College in the form attached [to the Order] 
 as Schedule "B", and shall abide by all recommendations of his preceptor with respect to practice 
 improvements and/or professional development related to his fulfillment of the educational need 
 and achievement of the outcome set out in Schedule "A"; and  

3.	Each of the abovenoted terms, 
 conditions and limitations on Dr. Namis' certificate of registration shall be removed upon 
 successful completion of the corresponding educational program, as required by paragraphs 2(a) and 
 (b) above.

4.	Dr. Namis shall, within 30 days, pay the College its costs of this proceeding in 
 the amount of $3,650.00.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 2, 2011