Namouz-Haddad, Shirin (CPSO#: 99947)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The Hebrew University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Mar 2013 to 23 May 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 24 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014