Nanar, Bikramjit Singh (CPSO#: 61028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Doctors Office
7125 Goreway Drive
Suite 201
Mississauga ON  L4T 4H3
Phone: (905) 405-8393
Fax: (905) 405-8972
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nanar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Nanar ( CPSO# 61028 )

Business Address:
Doctors Office
201 - 7125 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4T 4H3
Phone Number: (905) 405-8393

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Arizona
USA - California

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BIKRAMJIT SINGH NANAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1990