Nanaya, Ponnettira Kalappa (CPSO#: 56080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Apr 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Ouellette Campus
Department of Anesthesia
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4421
Fax: (519) 973-4443
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rose City Endoscopy
Suite 1060
2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N9A 1J1
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Southern Ontario Endoscopy centre
6124 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8T 1E6
Canada
Phone: (519) 915-9494
Fax: (519) 915-9493
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

CMR Health Care
Suite 102
700 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Canada
Phone: (519) 255-7563
Fax: (519) 258-9821
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ponnettira Nanaya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Nanaya ( CPSO# 56080 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4421

Business Address:
CMR Health Care
102 - 700 Tecumseh Road
Windsor ON  N8X 4T2
Phone Number: (519) 255-7563

Business Address:
Rose City Endoscopy
Suite 1060
2109 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8Y 1R8
Phone Number: (519) 254-4154

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 20 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PONNETTIRA KALAPPA NANAYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANAYA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990