Nancekievill, Elizabeth Anne (CPSO#: 59700)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 8
389 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone: (613) 476-8323
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Blanchard and Nancekievill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nancekievill ( CPSO# 59700 )
Dr. S. Blanchard ( CPSO# 57130 )

Business Address:
8 - 389 Main Street
Picton ON  K0K 2T0
Phone Number: (613) 476-8323

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare Prince Edward Site Picton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANNE NANCEKIEVILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANCEKIEVILL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Jul 1989
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1989