Nandagopal, Narayanan (CPSO#: 77048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 211
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 439-5775
Fax: (416) 439-5770
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2180 Steeles Ave W #218
Vaughan ON  L4K 2Z5
Canada
Phone: 6475601533
Fax: 8558934084
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. N. Nandagopal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nandagopal ( CPSO# 77048 )

Business Address:
Suite 211
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 439-5775

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 02 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NARAYANAN NANDAGOPAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NANDAGOPAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Aug 2003
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003