Nanka-Bruce, Richard Henry Merton (CPSO#: 28910)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 22 Mar 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Mar 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2003
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 16 Mar 2006
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 22 Mar 2006

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 22 Mar 2006
Summary:

 On March 22, 2006, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Nanka Bruce to have committed acts of 
 professional misconduct in that  he has been found guilty of offences that are relevant to his 
 suitability to practise, those offences being, two counts of indecent assault and two counts of 
 sexual assault involving four patients, imposed by the Superior Court of Justice on January 13, 
 2006.  The assaults took place in his office, during what purported to be clinical 
 examinations.The Committee ordered that Dr. Nanka-Bruce's certificate of registration be revoked 
 immediately.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 22, 2006


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 31 Mar 2003
Summary:

 On March 31, 2003, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Nanka-Bruce to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct relevant to the practice of medicine that having regard to all the 
 circumstances would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
 unprofessional.

The Committee ordered the following penalty:

1)	Dr. Nanka-Bruce attend befored 
 the panel to be reprimanded, the fact of the reprimand to 	be recorded on the Register.

2)	That a 
 condition or limitation be imposed on the certificate of registration of Dr. Nanka-	Bruce that he 
 not conduct any physical examinations of female patients except in the 	presence of a third party 
 who is at leat 21 years of age and is acceptable to the Registrar 	of the College.

3)	That Dr. 
 Nanka-Bruce may apply to the College for a variation or revocation of the 	condition set out in 
 paragraph 2 above, which application shall be made no earlier than 	one year after the date of 
 this order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Mar 31, 2003