Napolskikh, Ioulia (CPSO#: 101201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rivlin Medical Group
89 Queensway West
Suite 312
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: (905) 281-9898
Fax: (905) 281-9143
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dorothy Ley Hospice
220 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 0A7
Canada
Phone: (416) 626-2138
Fax: 2899040305
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IOULIA NAPOLSKIKH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAPOLSKIKH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016