Naqvi, Arif (CPSO#: 64163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2622 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1K 2S3
Phone: (416) 755-7755 Ext. 224
Fax: (416) 755-7509
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARIF NAQVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAQVI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1992
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2011