Naqvi, Syed Muhammad Ahmed (CPSO#: 69632)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jun 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Paediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8013
Fax: (416) 813-5327
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 2001 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 13 Mar 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 13 Mar 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 06 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 06 Jun 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 06 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 06 Nov 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Nov 2008 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Syed  Muhammad  Ahmed  Naqvi  may practise medicine independently in
                  paediatric haematology/oncology, only.