Narain, Ram Kumar (CPSO#: 72105)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mysore University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999