Narayanam Raghuveera Srinivasa, Surendra Babu (CPSO#: 92431)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sri Venkatesvara University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2010 to 12 Feb 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Feb 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013