Narayanan, Kanna Ranganathan Satya (CPSO#: 77855)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: Narayanan, Kanna (used until: 06 Jun 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone: (519) 352-6400 Ext. 6050
Fax: (519) 436-2515
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kanna Narayanan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Narayanan ( CPSO# 77855 )

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KANNA RANGANATHAN SATYA NARAYANAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYANAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2005