Narayanan, Prepageran (CPSO#: 78678)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Nov 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Nov 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Malaya, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 31 Oct 2003
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2003 to 15 Nov 2003
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2003