Narine, Nyan Khush (CPSO#: 86147)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2013
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015