Narula, Soni (CPSO#: 69841)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Guru Nanak Dev University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Apr 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997