Nasarullah, Fareeha (CPSO#: 86312)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1 Hospital Court
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 4579
Fax: (905) 721-7763
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3800 Brock Street North
Whitby ON  L1R 3A5
Canada
Phone: 905-666-3156
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

186 Thoronton Rd S
Oshawa ON  L1J 5Y2
Canada
Phone: 905-576-5181
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

82 Park Road North
Oshawa ON  L1J 4L1
Canada
Phone: 905-579-0011
Fax: 905-579-1733
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1635 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2K9
Canada
Phone: 905-576-0111
Fax: 905-576-4712
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: F. Nasarullah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Nasarullah ( CPSO# 86312 )

Business Address:
3800 Brock Street North
Whitby ON  L1R 3A5
Phone Number: (905) 666-3156

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
186 Thornton Road South
Oshawa ON  L1J 5Y2
Phone Number: (905) 576-5181

Business Address:
1635 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1N 2K9
Phone Number: (905) 576-0111

Business Address:
82 Park Road North
Oshawa ON  L1J 4L1
Phone Number: (905) 579-0011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAREEHA NASARULLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASARULLAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2009