Naseeb, Abdul Shaheed Ali (CPSO#: 75907)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 04 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Baghdad, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 04 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2002