Nasello, Constance Marie (CPSO#: 63747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
211 St Clair Street
Chatham ON  N7L 3J4
Phone: (519) 351-0626
Fax: (519) 351-6064
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nasello Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Nasello ( CPSO# 63747 )

Business Address:
211 St. Clair Street
Chatham ON  N7L 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 351-0626

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
St Joseph's Health Services,Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Sydenham District Hospital Wallaceburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CONSTANCE MARIE NASELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASELLO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992