Naser Al-Mobarak, Bassem Issa Mohammed (CPSO#: 63131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Fax: (416) 813-7543
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
Princess Margaret Hospital
Ontario Cancer Institute
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Naser Al-Mobarak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Naser Al-Mobarak ( CPSO# 63131 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7445

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 12 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BASSEM ISSA MOHAMMED NASER AL-MOBARAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NASER AL-MOBARAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Jul 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Jul 1992
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Aug 1994
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1997