Nash, Christopher Michael Robert (CPSO#: 90750)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 05 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 21 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Maternal Fetal Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 26 Oct 2012
Elective Trainee - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 05 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 05 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2016