Nash, Leslie Ann Sade (CPSO#: 29896)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 07 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Leslie Nash Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 14 Mar 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 17 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Jun 2017